Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/06/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/08/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/15/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/15/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/06/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/09/2007