Text: H.R.7219 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/2008)


110th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 7219

To impose a moratorium on the implementation of a Medicaid regulation related to the outpatient clinic and hospital facility services definition and upper payment limit.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
September 29, 2008

Mr. McHugh (for himself, Mr. Arcuri, Mr. Kuhl of New York, Mr. Walsh of New York, Mrs. Lowey, Mr. Allen, Mr. Hinchey, Mrs. Gillibrand, Mrs. Maloney of New York, and Mr. Towns) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce


A BILL

To impose a moratorium on the implementation of a Medicaid regulation related to the outpatient clinic and hospital facility services definition and upper payment limit.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Protecting Hospital Outpatient and Community Clinic Services Act of 2008”.

SEC. 2. Moratorium on regulation related to outpatient clinic and hospital facility services definition and upper payment limit.

(a) In general.—Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Secretary of Health and Human Services shall not take, before April 1, 2009, any action (including promulgation of regulation, issuance of regulatory guidance, use of Federal payment audit procedures, or other administrative action, policy, or practice, including a Medical Assistance Manual transmittal or letter to State Medicaid directors) to impose any restrictions relating to the provision described in subsection (b) if such restrictions are more restrictive in any aspect than those that applied to the subject matter of the provision as of September 27, 2007.

(b) Proposed regulation relating to redefinition of medicaid outpatient hospital services.—The provision described in this subsection is the proposed regulation relating to clarification of outpatient clinic and hospital facility services definition and upper payment limit under the Medicaid program published on September 28, 2007 (72 Federal Register 55158) in its entirety.