Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/13/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/18/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/04/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/01/2008