Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/08/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/22/2008