Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/20/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/27/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/23/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/25/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/10/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/15/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/07/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/26/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/02/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/03/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/2008