Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/22/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/25/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/15/2007