Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/07/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/07/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/15/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007