Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/07/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/15/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/14/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/07/2007