Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/30/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/12/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/12/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/21/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/16/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/31/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/21/2008