Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/08/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/11/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/20/2008