Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/31/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/22/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/25/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/25/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/02/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/02/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/08/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/08/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/25/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/22/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/09/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/15/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/01/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/27/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/19/2008