There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Antitrust Modernization Commission Extension Act of 2007

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Antitrust Modernization Commission Extension Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Antitrust Modernization Commission Extension Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Antitrust Modernization Commission Extension Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Antitrust Modernization Commission Act of 2002, to extend the term of the Antitrust Modernization Commission and to make a technical correction.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
02/26/2007Became Public Law No: 110-6. (TXT | PDF)
02/26/2007Signed by President.
02/16/2007Presented to President.
02/12/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1873)
02/07/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1297)
01/31/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
02/26/2007Became Public Law No: 110-6. (TXT | PDF)
02/26/2007Signed by President.
02/16/2007HousePresented to President.
02/12/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/12/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1873)
02/08/2007SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
02/07/2007-12:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/07/2007-12:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1297)
02/07/2007-12:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 742.
02/07/2007-12:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1297-1299)
02/07/2007-12:40pmHouseMr. Conyers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/01/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E245)
01/31/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/31/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/31/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/31/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.742. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-6 (02/26/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Antitrust Modernization Commission Extension Act of 2007 - Amends the Antitrust Modernization Commission Act of 2002 to extend the termination date of the Antitrust Modernization Commission to 60 (currently, 30) days after the Commission's report to the President and Congress.