Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/05/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/13/2007