Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/12/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/16/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/05/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/12/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/20/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/08/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/24/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/22/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/27/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/11/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/16/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/17/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/04/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/14/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew