Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/31/2007