Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/14/2008