Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008