Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/06/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/14/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/19/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/28/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/01/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/16/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/12/2008