Text: H.R.783 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (01/22/2008)

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 783 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]






                                                       Calendar No. 558
110th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 783


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            October 23, 2007

                                Received

             January 22 (legislative day, January 3), 2008

                 Read twice and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
   To modify the boundary of Mesa Verde National Park, and for other 
                               purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Mesa Verde National Park Boundary 
Expansion Act of 2007''.

SEC. 2. FINDINGS; PURPOSES.

    (a) Findings.--Congress finds that--
            (1) on June 29, 1906, Mesa Verde National Park was 
        established as the first national park in the United States to 
        preserve the works of humanity;
            (2) on September 6, 1978, Mesa Verde National Park became 
        the first World Heritage Site designated in the United States; 
        and
            (3) Mesa Verde National Park protects some of the best 
        preserved and notable archeological sites of the ancient 
        Puebloan culture that flourished in the southwestern United 
        States from approximately 600-1300, including the elaborate 
        stone villages in the sheltered alcoves of the canyon walls 
        referred to as ``cliff dwellings''.
    (b) Purposes.--The purposes of this Act are--
            (1) to modify the boundary of Mesa Verde National Park--
                    (A) to protect the archeological sites located on 
                property adjacent to the Park boundary;
                    (B) to extend and expand the knowledge and 
                understanding of the ancient Puebloan culture, a major 
                influence in the development of the southwestern United 
                States;
                    (C) to protect from potential development the 
                scenic and biological value of the pinyon-juniper 
                covered hills that--
                            (i) border the Park; and
                            (ii) are in full view of the Park entrance 
                        road; and
                    (D) to protect the largest recorded colony of the 
                globally imperiled Gray's Townsend Daisy, to ensure 
                continuation of a major wildlife corridor, and to 
                protect important habitat for wildlife; and
            (2) to provide greater opportunities to visitors, 
        researchers, and surrounding communities to understand and 
        appreciate the natural environment of Mesa Verde and the 
        contributions of the ancient Puebloan culture to the region by 
        providing the land required to construct a contemporary museum 
        collections storage facility and visitor orientation center.

SEC. 3. DEFINITIONS.

    In this Act:
            (1) Map.--The term ``map'' means the map entitled ``Mesa 
        Verde National Park Proposed Boundary Adjustment'', numbered 
        307/80,180, and dated March 1, 2007.
            (2) Park.--The term ``Park'' means the Mesa Verde National 
        Park in the State of Colorado.
            (3) Secretary.--The term ``Secretary'' means the Secretary 
        of the Interior.

SEC. 4. MESA VERDE NATIONAL PARK.

    (a) Acquisition of Land.--
            (1) In general.--The Secretary may acquire the land or an 
        interest in the land described in subsection (b) for addition 
        to the Park.
            (2) Means.--An acquisition of land under paragraph (1) may 
        be made by donation, purchase from a willing seller with 
        donated or appropriated funds, or exchange.
    (b) Description of Land.--The land referred to in subsection (a)(1) 
is the approximately 360 acres of land adjacent to the Park, as 
generally depicted on the map.
    (c) Availability of Map.--The map shall be on file and available 
for inspection in the appropriate offices of the National Park Service.
    (d) Boundary Modification.--The boundary of the Park shall be 
revised to reflect the acquisition of the land under subsection (a).
    (e) Administration.--The Secretary shall administer any land or 
interest in land acquired under subsection (a)(1) as part of the Park 
in accordance with the laws (including regulations) applicable to the 
Park.

SEC. 5. AUTHORIZATION OF APPROPRIATIONS.

    There are authorized to be appropriated such sums as are necessary 
to carry out this Act.

            Passed the House of Representatives October 22, 2007.

            Attest:

                                            LORRAINE C. MILLER,

                                                                 Clerk.
                                                       Calendar No. 558

110th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                               H. R. 783

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT

   To modify the boundary of Mesa Verde National Park, and for other 
                               purposes.

_______________________________________________________________________

             January 22 (legislative day, January 3), 2008

                 Read twice and placed on the calendar

Share This