Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/31/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/31/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/07/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/27/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/27/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/18/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/16/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/28/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/01/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/08/2008