Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/08/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/08/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/12/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/15/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/06/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/12/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/15/2007