Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/13/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/15/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/28/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/12/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/14/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/19/2007