Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/06/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/06/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/26/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/01/2007