Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/14/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/01/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/11/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/09/2008