Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/21/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/21/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/2007