Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/08/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/08/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/09/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/12/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/27/2007