Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/12/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/15/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/10/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/13/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/14/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/22/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/10/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/11/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2008