Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/05/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/15/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/27/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/23/2007