There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Denali National Park and Alaska Railroad Exchange Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to House

Denali National Park and Alaska Railroad Exchange Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Denali National Park and Alaska Railroad Land Exchange Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

A bill to authorize the exchange of certain interests in land in Denali National Park in the State of Alaska.

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the exchange of certain lands in Denali National Park in the State of Alaska.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2008Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-316.
10/22/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11785)
10/22/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-395.
02/05/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/11/2008SenateIndefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5530)
04/10/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 668.
04/10/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-316.
01/30/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/23/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/22/2007-2:41pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/22/2007-2:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/22/2007-2:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11785)
10/22/2007-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 830.
10/22/2007-2:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11785)
10/22/2007-2:37pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/22/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
10/22/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-395.
10/10/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/10/2007HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
10/10/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/27/2007HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
02/09/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/05/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/05/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources02/05/2007 Referred to
10/10/2007 Markup by
10/22/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-395
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands02/09/2007 Referred to
09/27/2007 Hearings by
10/10/2007 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/23/2007 Referred to
01/30/2008 Markup by
04/10/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-316

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.830. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/22/2007)

Denali National Park and Alaska Railroad Exchange Act of 2007 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to grant to the Alaska Railroad Corporation an exclusive use easement on land that is identified by the Secretary within Denali National Park to provide a location to the Corporation for the construction, maintenance, and on-going operation of track and associated support facilities for turning railroad trains around near Denali Park Station. Directs the Secretary, in exchange for the easement granted, to require the relinquishment of certain portions of the Corporation's existing exclusive use easement within the boundary of the Park.

Requires that the acreage of the easements exchanged under this Act be approximately equal. Limits the total acreage of the easement to 25 acres.

Requires the easement conveyed to the Corporation to be under the same terms as the exclusive use easement granted to the Alaska Railroad in the Park in a specified deed. States that the easement relinquished by the Corporation, respecting the portion being exchanged, shall be the full title and interest received by the Alaska Railroad in such deed.

Requires the Alaska Railroad to pay all costs associated with such land exchange, including the costs of compliance with the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969, the costs of any surveys, and other reasonable costs.

Designates the lands underlying any easement relinquished to the United States under this Act that are adjacent to designated wilderness as wilderness and added to the Denali Wilderness, the boundaries of which are modified accordingly. Requires the designated lands to be managed according to the applicable provisions of the Wilderness Act and the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act of 1980.

Instructs the Secretary to require any additional terms and conditions that the Secretary determines are appropriate to protect the interests of the United States and of the Park.