Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/14/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/12/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/21/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/21/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/16/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/01/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/2008