Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/26/2008