Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008