Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/13/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/13/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/13/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/13/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/09/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/15/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/09/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/13/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/26/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/06/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/26/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/24/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/24/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/22/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/03/2008