There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to revive previous authority on the use of the Armed Forces and the militia to address interference with State or Federal law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/07/2007Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/06/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/14/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/25/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 08/03/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/07/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.869. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2007)

Amends the John Warner National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2007 to repeal provisions authorizing the President to: (1) employ the Armed Forces to restore public order and enforce the law in major public emergencies; and (2) provide supplies, services, and equipment to persons affected by the situation.

Restores previous authority of the President to use the Armed Forces to suppress situations which interfere with state or federal law.