Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/09/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/09/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/09/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/09/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/16/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/16/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/16/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/16/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/16/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/31/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/31/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/11/2008