Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/13/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/07/2007