Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/14/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/14/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/14/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/14/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/23/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/20/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/20/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/08/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2007