Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/27/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/15/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/15/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/23/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/23/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/23/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/16/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/13/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/02/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/05/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/05/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/05/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/16/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 12/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/18/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/17/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/17/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/29/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/26/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/26/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/19/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew