Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/06/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/15/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2008