Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/09/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/09/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/09/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/09/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/09/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/09/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/09/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/09/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/09/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/09/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/09/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/12/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/12/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/12/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/12/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/2008