Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/16/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/16/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/30/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/26/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/19/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/20/2007