Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/07/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/07/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/06/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/08/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/20/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/22/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/18/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/07/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/07/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/01/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/01/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/01/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2008