Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/09/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/11/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/11/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/21/2007