Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/06/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/12/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/12/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/21/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/19/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2007