Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/07/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2008