Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/18/2007