Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/07/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-344.
10/07/2008 Signed by President.
09/26/2008 Presented to President.
09/24/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9350-9355)
06/20/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 2 (Roll no. 512).(text: CR H6742-6743)
06/19/2007 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 110-200.
02/08/2007 Introduced in House