Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/12/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/12/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/23/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/13/2007