Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/14/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/14/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/27/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/28/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/28/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/28/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/13/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/30/2007