Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/05/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/25/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/2008